FL S0510 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health to establish and administer the Florida Rural Hospital Capital Improvement Competitive Grant Program for certain rural hospitals; deleting requirements for certain information in grant applications, etc.
Title
Grant Program for Rural Hospitals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 05/01/17, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/18/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/21/17, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0429 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee