FL S0504 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Chapter No. 2017-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Chapter No. 2017-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting provisions which have become inoperative by noncurrent repeal or expiration and, pursuant to s. 11.242(5)(b) and (i), F.S., may be omitted from the 2017 Florida Statutes only through a reviser's bill duly enacted by the Legislature, etc.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Chapter No. 2017-4 | |
2017-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-31 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2017-03-23 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-22 | House | Substituted for HB 7017 |
2017-03-16 | House | Received |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/22/17 |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-03-08 | House | In Messages |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2017-03-08 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/17 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/22/17, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7017 (Similar To) 2017-03-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 504 (Ch. 2017-4)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 292 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 1415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
388 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9986 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 1832 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 91195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 91196 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 962 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 386 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |