FL S0504 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5601 (Ch. 2014-38)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5601 (Ch. 2014-38)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing procedures, requirements, and calculation methodologies that allow dealers to obtain tax credits or refunds for taxes paid on worthless or uncollectible private-label credit card accounts or receivables; providing limitations on the amount that may be recovered, etc.
Title
Tax Credits or Refunds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5601 (Ch. 2014-38) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/10/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0853 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5601 (Ch. 2014-38)
H5601 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-38, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 805 (Ch. 2014-132), HB 5001 (Ch. 2014-51), CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2014-40)
H5601 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-38, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 805 (Ch. 2014-132), HB 5001 (Ch. 2014-51), CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2014-40)