FL S0504 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on October 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 173 -SJ 913
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 173 -SJ 913
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting obsolete references; revising the types of diversified and innovative programs to provide rehabilitative treatment that may be developed or contracted for by the department, to include mother-infant programs and remove reference to an obsolete program; authorizing the department, at the secretary's discretion, to pay up to a specified amount toward the basic funeral expenses for a youth who dies while in the custody of the department and whose parents or guardians are indigent and for which no other funding is available, etc.
Title
Department of Juvenile Justice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 173 -SJ 913 | |
2012-03-07 | Read 2nd time -SJ 913 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/12 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 776 | |
2012-02-01 | Now in Budget -SJ 314 | |
2012-02-01 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 314 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 02/01/12, 10:15 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-13 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2012-01-13 | Now in Budget -SJ 135 | |
2012-01-12 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 135 | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time -SJ 104 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 45 | |
2011-12-22 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/12/12, 10:15 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-12-07 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 112 | |
2011-11-17 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-11-17 | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 112 | |
2011-11-07 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/17/11, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-11-02 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 45 | |
2011-10-10 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
984 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 0301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 688 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 721 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |