FL S0502 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain counties to issue a certificate of public convenience and necessity to applicants seeking licensure for basic or advanced life support services which meet specified criteria, etc.
Title
Certificates of Public Convenience and Necessity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/02/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Filed |