FL S0498 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 467 (Ch. 2017-85)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 467 (Ch. 2017-85)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that applications for funding for certain agriculture education and promotion facilities must be postmarked or electronically submitted by a certain date; revising the standards for applicant eligibility to take the licensure examination to practice as a surveyor or mapper; repealing provisions relating to maximum permit fees for taximeters; revising the requirements to obtain a license to carry a concealed weapon or firearm, etc.
Title
Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Judiciary Committee | Senate Commerce and Tourism Committee | Sen. Dana Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 467 (Ch. 2017-85) |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 467 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 14 NAYS 4 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-29 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/22/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-08 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/06/17, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0467 (Same As) 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-85
H1161 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 467 (Ch. 2017-85)
S1452 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 467 (Ch. 2017-85)
S784 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 467 (Ch. 2017-85)
H1161 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 467 (Ch. 2017-85)
S1452 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 467 (Ch. 2017-85)
S784 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 467 (Ch. 2017-85)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
288 | 1175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 0351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 0366 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
487 | 2041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
531 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
531 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
531 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
534 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
534 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
534 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
573 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
590 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
597 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
604 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |