FL S0494 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that witnesses be interviewed and certain information be provided to a firefighter subjected to interrogation before the interrogation is conducted; prohibiting a firefighter from being threatened with certain disciplinary action during the course of an interrogation; requiring that a firefighter be notified and provided certain information before certain disciplinary actions are taken, etc.
Title
Firefighters' Bill of Rights
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Sen. Ed Hooper [R] | Sen. Douglas Broxson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Messages |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-25 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-25 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/21/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-14 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H161 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 825 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |