FL S0492 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that, except as otherwise expressly prohibited by the State Constitution, a county or municipality may regulate the field of possession of firearms on property owned by such county or municipality, etc.
Title
Regulation of Firearms and Ammunition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Rules |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0305 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
790 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/492 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0492/BillText/Filed/HTML |