FL S0488 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration, in conjunction with the Department of Health, to establish the Food is Medicine Pilot Program to provide Medicaid coverage for purchases and deliveries of prescribed health-promoting foods under certain circumstances; requiring the agency, in conjunction with the department, to seek federal approval and waivers for the pilot program; requiring allocation of a portion of the pilot program implementation budget to a specified organization for the establishment of a specified center, etc.
Title
Medicaid Coverage for Prescribed Foods for Disease Treatment and Prevention
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Polsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-11-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H253 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Select Committee on Health Innovation
H265 (Similar To) 2023-10-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H265 (Similar To) 2023-10-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/488 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/488/BillText/Filed/HTML |