FL S0488 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the circumstances under which the court must appoint an attorney for a dependent child; increasing the maximum attorney fees that may be charged per child per year by attorneys appointed to represent dependent children; requiring the Department of Children and Families to enter into an agreement with the Justice Administrative Commission to obtain specified federal funds, etc.
Title
Appointment of Attorneys for Dependent Children with Certain Special Needs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/488 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/488/BillText/Filed/PDF |