FL S0488 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 277 (Ch. 2016-121), CS/HJR 275 (Passed)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 277 (Ch. 2016-121), CS/HJR 275 (Passed)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the homestead tax exemption that may be adopted by a county or municipality by ordinance for the assessed value of property with a just value less than $250,000 which is owned by persons age 65 or older who meet certain residence and income requirements; specifying that just value shall be determined in the first tax year that the owner applies and is eligible for the exemption; providing for a refund of overpaid taxes in prior years, etc.
Title
County and Municipality Homestead Tax Exemption
Sponsors
Senate Finance and Tax Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Sen. Anitere Flores [R] | Sen. Gwen Margolis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 277 (Ch. 2016-121), CS/HJR 275 (Passed) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 277 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/16 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/01/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 01/25/16, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-11-17 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 11/17/15, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-10-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0492 (Related) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HJR 275 (Passed), CS/HB 277 (Ch. 2016-121)
H0277 (Same As) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-121, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HJR 275 (Passed)
H0275 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 277 (Ch. 2016-121)
H0277 (Same As) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-121, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HJR 275 (Passed)
H0275 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 277 (Ch. 2016-121)