FL S0488 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-186
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-186
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires motor vehicle registration application forms to provide for a voluntary contribution to Florida Network of Children's Advocacy Centers, Inc. Provides for the use of such funds.
Title
Vehicle Registration Forms/Voluntary Contribution [CPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-28 - House - House Roll Call No. 1053 - Passage (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0018 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0018 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-186 | |
2010-05-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 00991 | |
2010-04-28 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01224; Passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 -HJ 01224 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01170; Substituted for HB 609 -HJ 01170 | |
2010-04-26 | Received -HJ 01096; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01096 | |
2010-04-23 | In Messages | |
2010-04-22 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00727; Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00727 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00679 | |
2010-04-16 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00636 | |
2010-04-15 | Favorable by- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -SJ 00636 | |
2010-04-12 | On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 04/15/10, 2:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-04-07 | Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 301-S | |
2010-03-19 | Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00278 | |
2010-03-18 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00278 | |
2010-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/18/10, 1:00 pm, 401-S | |
2010-03-10 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00188; Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 00188 | |
2010-03-05 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/10/10, 8:00 am, 37-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Transportation; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00041 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Transportation; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-10-20 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0609 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 488; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 488 (Ch. 2010-186) -HJ 01170