FL S0486 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-10 - Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Pending: Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing provisions relating to the Florida Best and Brightest Teacher Program and the Florida Best and Brightest Principal Program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Best and Brightest Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-10SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-12-09SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 12/09/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-11-01SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-10-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S440 (Similar To) 2019-10-08 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012731Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012732Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback