FL S0484 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1 (Ch. 2021-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1 (Ch. 2021-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a resident of a municipality to file an appeal to the Administration Commission if the governing body of the municipality makes a specified reduction to the operating budget of a municipal law enforcement agency; creating a cause of action against a municipality for obstructing or interfering with reasonable law enforcement protection during a riot or an unlawful assembly; increasing the offense severity ranking of an aggravated assault for the purposes of the Criminal Punishment Code if committed in furtherance of a riot or an aggravated riot; prohibiting defacing, injuring, or damaging a memorial; prohibiting cyberintimidation by publication, etc.
Title
Combating Public Disorder
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1 (Ch. 2021-6) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Chapter No. 2021-6
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
166 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 0495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
806 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
806 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
810 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
836 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
870 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
870 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
870 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
870 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
872 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/484 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/484/BillText/Filed/HTML |