FL S0482 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Innovation, Industry, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing provisions relating to limitations on the size of individual wine containers and individual cider containers; revising provisions that authorize a restaurant to allow patrons to remove partially consumed bottles of wine from the restaurant for off-premises consumption; revising the requirements for the sale of branded products by a licensed craft distillery to consumers; authorizing a craft distillery to transfer specified quantities of specified distilled spirits from certain locations to its souvenir gift shop, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beverage Law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-01SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2019-10-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S138 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Introduced
H6037 (Similar To) 2020-01-17 - Placed on Calendar
H583 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Now in Commerce Committee
H1165 (Similar To) 2020-01-24 - On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
561221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
564055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56503Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback