FL S0478 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the purposes of the Commission on Mental Health and Substance Abuse to include an assessment of the state's suicide prevention infrastructure; revising the duties of the commission to include duties relating to the state's suicide prevention infrastructure, etc.
Title
Suicide Prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Filed |