FL S0474 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing criminal penalties for specified prohibited practices by a landlord relating to maintenance of the premises, retaliatory conduct, and other protections, etc.
Title
Landlords and Tenants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0053 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
83 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/474 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0474/BillText/Filed/HTML |