FL S0472 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1439 (Ch. 2017-223)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1439 (Ch. 2017-223)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing space and seating requirements for the issuance of special alcoholic beverage licenses to event centers, etc.
Title
Charlotte County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1439 (Ch. 2017-223) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2017-03-29 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/28/17, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1439 (Similar To) 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-223