FL S0468 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the state courts system to use state revenues, if available, to provide court-appointed interpreting services to nonindigent individuals; repealing the cost recovery requirement for court-appointed interpreting services, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court Interpreter Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-08SenateDied on Calendar
2024-02-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2024-02-22SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2024-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2024-02-13SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2024-02-13SenateFavorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2024-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
2024-02-06SenateNow in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2024-02-05SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2024-01-31SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced
2023-11-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
2023-11-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1393 (Same As) 2024-05-07 - Chapter No. 2024-154

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
290185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
290195Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/468
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/468/BillText/Filed/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/468/Analyses/2024s00468.pre.ju.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/468/Analyses/2024s00468.ju.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/468/Analyses/2024s00468.pre.acj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/468/Analyses/2024s00468.acj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/468/Analyses/2024s00468.pre.fp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/468/Analyses/2024s00468.fp.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/468/Vote/2024-02-05%200230PM~S00468%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/468/Vote/2024-02-13%200830AM~S00468%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/468/Vote/2024-02-22%201200PM~S00468%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback