FL S0466 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the purposes for which the proceeds of the tourist development tax may be used to include the payment of the debt service on bonds to finance the construction, reconstruction, or renovation of a professional sports facility on publically owned land and the expansion, renovation, or reconstruction of a convention center. Limits the percentage of the proceeds from the tourist development tax that may be used for the professional sports facility. Provides for controlling application notwithstanding certain contrary authority, etc.
Title
Tourist Development Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-24 | Now in Community Affairs -SJ 270 | |
2011-03-23 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-22 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 -SJ 270 | |
2011-03-17 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/22/11, 1:15 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 42 | |
2011-01-27 | References corrected to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Budget | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Community Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Budget -SJ 42 | |
2011-01-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0141 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration