FL S0460 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a Florida College System institution to waive any portion of certain postsecondary fees for active duty members of the Armed Forces of the United States who use military tuition assistance; specifying that the student who receives the fee waiver may be reported for state funding purposes, etc.
Title
Postsecondary Fee Waivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 75 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Substituted HB 75 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/27/18 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education, 01/17/18, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 12/06/17, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; Appropriations |
2017-10-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H75 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Chapter No. 2018-8
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/460 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/460/BillText/Filed/HTML |