FL S0456 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring an application for an identification card or a driver license, respectively, to provide for male, female, or nonbinary gender designation, etc.
Title
Driver License and Identification Card Gender Designation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H249 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 093 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/456 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/456/BillText/Filed/HTML |