FL S0448 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the terms "advanced birth center" and "medical director"; providing requirements for advanced birth center facilities and equipment; providing minimum standards for advanced birth centers; providing for the education and orientation of advanced birth center clients and their families, etc.
Title
Advanced Birth Centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H383 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
S1026 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
H1147 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
S1026 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
H1147 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 3081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 3105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 3131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 324 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 327 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 332 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 820 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |