FL S0442 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Redefines "special risk member." Revises criteria for membership in the special risk class to include members employed by public acute care hospitals serving certain patients. Provides legislative findings that the act fulfills an important state interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Retirement System

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 40
2011-01-21 Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 40
2011-01-13 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H1405 () 2011-04-07 - Read 3rd time -HJ 464
S1540 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
121021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1210515Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback