FL S0440 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 401 (Ch. 2017-17)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 401 (Ch. 2017-17)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the list of forms of identification which a notary public may rely on in notarizing a signature on a document to include a veteran health information card, etc.
Title
Notaries Public
Sponsors
Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security Committee | Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] | Sen. Victor Torres [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 401 (Ch. 2017-17) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 401 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/04/17 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/29/17, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/06/17, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/21/17, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0401 (Same As) 2017-05-10 - Chapter No. 2017-17