FL S0440 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring each state or local law enforcement agency that seizes property for the purpose of forfeiture to perform a specified periodic review at least annually; requiring a seizing agency to have certain written policies, procedures, and training to comply with specified legal requirements; requiring each state or local law enforcement agency that seizes property for the purpose of forfeiture to complete an annual report, etc.
Title
Contraband Forfeiture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2015-03-31 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/30/15, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1131 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1534 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
S1534 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 3451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
323 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
874 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
932 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
932 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
932 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
932 | 7061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |