FL S0436 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a portion of county or municipal vessel registration fees to be used for specified additional purposes, etc.
Title
Use of Vessel Registration Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Hooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Messages |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 363 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/03/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Now in Environment and Natural Resources |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Environment and Natural Resources; Rules |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H529 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar