FL S0424 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that unfair discrimination on the basis of gun ownership in the provision of personal lines property or personal lines automobile insurance is a discriminatory insurance practice; clarifying that insurers are not prevented from charging supplemental premiums or sharing information between an insurer and its agent if a separate rider has been requested, etc.
Title
Discriminatory Insurance Practices
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Criminal Justice Committee | Sen. Tom Lee [R] | Sen. Jack Latvala [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#615 (Y: 74 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-180 | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-22 | House | CS passed; YEAS 74 NAYS 44 |
2014-04-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-21 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-21 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 255 |
2014-04-17 | House | Received |
2014-04-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/14 |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-03-20 | House | In Messages |
2014-03-18 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 3 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/14 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 2 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/06/14, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/03/14, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Favorable with 2 amendment(s) by Banking and Insurance (554246, 965502); YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2014-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/14/14, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0255 (Similar To) 2014-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 424 (Ch. 2014-180)