FL S0422 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Ethics and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to provide for the election of the Commissioner of Education and his or her inclusion as a member of the Cabinet and the State Board of Education, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election of the Commissioner of Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Education; Rules
2019-01-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1309 (Same As) 2019-03-08 - Referred to Education Committee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; Judiciary Committee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback