FL S0418 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 93 (Ch. 2016-76)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 93 (Ch. 2016-76)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a law enforcement agency that authorizes its law enforcement officers to wear body cameras to establish policies and procedures addressing the proper use, maintenance, and storage of body cameras and the data recorded by body cameras; requiring such policies and procedures to include specified information; requiring that data recorded by body cameras be retained in accordance with specified requirements, etc.
Title
Law Enforcement Officer Body Cameras
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 93 (Ch. 2016-76) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Substituted HB 93 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/24/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/16/16, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/01/16, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-10-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2015-10-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0093 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-76
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/418 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0418/BillText/Filed/HTML |