FL S0410 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Health to establish a long-acting reversible contraception pilot program in Duval, Hillsborough, and Palm Beach Counties; requiring the department to contract with family planning providers to implement the pilot program; requiring the department to submit a report to the Governor and the Legislature by a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Long-acting Reversible Contraception Pilot Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-08SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-04-08SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
2019-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/08/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-01-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H579 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38100515Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback