FL S0394 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that certified registered nurse anesthetists, to the extent authorized by a protocol established in collaboration with the medical staff of a facility in which the anesthetic service is performed, may determine, in collaboration with the responsible physician, the appropriate type of anesthesia, etc.
Title
Advanced Registered Nurse Practitioners
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Steube [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/394 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0394/BillText/Filed/HTML |