FL S0390 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing partial reimbursement of ad valorem taxes paid on homestead properties that are rendered uninhabitable from damage inflicted by a hurricane or tornado during 2016; requiring that the property owner provide documentation that the property was uninhabitable; providing for reimbursement of the state sales tax paid on the purchase of a mobile home to replace a mobile home that experienced major damage from a hurricane or tornado during 2016, etc.
Title
Reimbursement of Certain Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/06/17, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0279 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
216 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |