FL S0388 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides legislative findings and purpose. Provides guiding principles to be used by state agency personnel when dealing with children of incarcerated parents. Provides applicability.
Title
Children of Incarcerated Parents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 36 | |
2011-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/22/11, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Rules -SJ 36 | |
2011-01-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0133 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/388 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0388/BillText/Filed/HTML |