FL S0384 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Florida Transportation Commission to review all sources of revenue for transportation infrastructure and maintenance projects and prepare a report to the Governor and the Legislature when the commission determines that electric and hybrid vehicles make up a certain percentage or more of the total number of vehicles registered in this state; requiring a long-range transportation plan to consider infrastructure and technological improvements necessary to accommodate the increased use of autonomous technology and electric vehicles, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric and Hybrid Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateCS by Transportation read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2017-12-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-05SenateCS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 12/05/17, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-10-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H981 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S852 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
339175Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback