FL S0380 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the installation, for compensation, of certain tires on specified motor vehicles; specifying what constitutes an unsafe used tire; providing that violations of the act are deceptive and unfair trade practices, etc.
Title
Unsafe Tires
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-08 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/06/17, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0801 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee