FL S0370 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating requirements that the closed portion of a meeting of the State Child Abuse Death Review Committee or a local committee at which specified identifying information is discussed be recorded, and that no portion of such meeting be off the record, etc.
Title
Public Records and Public Meetings Exemptions
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/04/14, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/370 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0370/BillText/Filed/HTML |