FL S0364 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the Independent Living Task Force within the Florida Housing Finance Corporation; defining the term "disability"; requiring the task force to submit a report to the Governor and the Legislature by a specified date, etc.
Title
Independent Living Task Force
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Sen. Kevin Rader [D] | Sen. Victor Torres [D] |
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-09 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (702694) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/12/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-14 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-12-09 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 12/09/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/05/19, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Community Affairs; Rules |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H39 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S340 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S340 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Withdrawn prior to introduction