FL S0364 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Including notice of the approval of an application for Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals status issued by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services as valid proof of identity for purposes of applying for a driver license, etc.
Title
Driver License Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0431 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/364 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0364/BillText/Filed/HTML |