FL S0364 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1054
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1054
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting local governments from restricting access to public facilities or infrastructure for certain activities based on whether a blood establishment is operating as a for-profit organization or not-for-profit organization; prohibiting a blood establishment from considering whether certain customers are operating as for-profit organizations or not-for-profit organizations when determining service fees for selling blood or blood components; requiring that certain blood establishments disclose specified information on the Internet; exempting certain blood establishments from the requirements to be permitted as a prescription drug manufacturer and register products; authorizing the Department of Business and Professional Regulation to adopt rules regarding the distribution of prescription drugs by blood establishments, etc.
Title
Blood Establishments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#54 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1133 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1133 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1054 | |
2012-03-08 | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (982397) -SJ 1052 | |
2012-03-07 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-07 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 1 -HJ 1163 | |
2012-03-07 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1163 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1126 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -HJ 1099 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 1100 | |
2012-01-11 | In Messages | |
2012-01-10 | Immediately certified -SJ 11 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 35 | |
2012-01-09 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/10/12 | |
2011-11-16 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 113 | |
2011-11-07 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-11-03 | CS by- Health Regulation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 113 | |
2011-10-24 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 11/03/11, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-10-18 | Referred to Health Regulation -SJ 35 | |
2011-09-29 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 06014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |