FL S0358 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to prohibit the practice of hydraulic fracturing in the State of Florida, etc.
Title
Hydraulic Fracturing
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Judiciary; Rules |
2015-09-25 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/358 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0358/BillText/Filed/HTML |