FL S0358 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Congress of the United States to honor the provisions of the Constitution of the United States and United States Supreme Court case law which limit the scope and exercise of federal power.
Title
Exercise of Federal Power
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-30 | In Messages | |
2011-03-29 | Read 2nd time -SJ 297 | |
2011-03-24 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/29/11 | |
2011-03-23 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 269 | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 10 NAYS 1 -SJ 226 | |
2011-03-10 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/15/11, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 35 | |
2011-02-09 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 117 | |
2011-02-08 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 117 | |
2011-01-31 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/08/11, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-01-12 | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules -SJ 35 | |
2011-01-05 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/358 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0358/BillText/Filed/HTML |