FL S0354 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies laws and rules to be enforced by the Department of Health. Provides for the adoption of rules. Revises applicability of recreational vehicle park requirements to mobile home parks. Revises permit requirements. Provides requirements for construction review and approval for private parks and camps. Revises requirements for permit applications. Revises fees charged to operators of certain parks or camps, etc.
Title
Mobile Home and Recreational Vehicle Parks [SPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0013 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-04-29 | In Messages | |
2010-04-29 | Read 3rd time -SJ 01037; CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 -SJ 01038 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00918 | |
2010-04-23 | Withdrawn from Finance and Tax -SJ 00796; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-04-19 | Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00599 | |
2010-04-15 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-13 | CS/CS/CS by Health and Human Services Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00599; CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -SJ 00601 | |
2010-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Appropriations, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Health Regulation; Community Affairs; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00033; On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 01/19/10, 10:30 am, 412-K; CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00163; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -SJ 00153; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/10, 8:15 am, 412-K --Not received; Now in Community Affairs -SJ 00163; On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/16/10, 10:00 am, 412-K; CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00164; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -SJ 00154; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Remaining references corrected to Health and Human Services Appropriations; Finance and Tax -SJ 00160; Now in Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00164 | |
2010-03-01 | Remaining references corrected to Health and Human Services Appropriations; Finance and Tax; Now in Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-02-16 | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | |
2010-02-08 | Now in Community Affairs; On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/16/10, 10:00 am, 412-K | |
2010-01-22 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/10, 8:15 am, 412-K --Not received | |
2010-01-20 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-01-19 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | |
2010-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 01/19/10, 10:30 am, 412-K | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Health Regulation; Community Affairs; Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2009-10-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0197 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0513 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0513 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0513 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0513 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0513 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0513 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0513 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0513 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0513 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0513 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0513 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0513 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0513 | 1115 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0513 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0513 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0513 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |