FL S0348 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the permitted scope of local laws, ordinances, and regulations with respect to vacation rentals; providing an exemption for subsequent amendments of certain provisions of existing local laws, ordinances, and regulations adopted on or before a specified date, etc.
Title
Vacation Rentals
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1158 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H4045 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
S1598 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Withdrawn from further consideration
H1295 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
H4045 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
S1598 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Withdrawn from further consideration
H1295 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/348 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0348/BillText/Filed/HTML |