FL S0346 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing municipalities and counties to require that the electrical journeyman who is present on certain industrial or commercial construction sites possess a certificate of competency, etc.
Title
Electrical Contracting
Sponsors
Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/346 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0346/BillText/Filed/HTML |