FL S0346 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that the Governor adopt a protocol on flag display; requiring the protocol to have guidelines for proper flag display and for lowering the state flag to half-staff on certain occasions; authorizing the Governor to adopt, repeal, or modify any rule or custom as the Governor deems appropriate which pertains to the display of the state flag, etc.
Title
Flag Etiquette
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Messages | |
2012-02-23 | In Messages | |
2012-02-14 | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 512 | |
2012-02-14 | Read 3rd time -SJ 512 | |
2012-02-13 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-13 | Read 2nd time -SJ 492 | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/13/12 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 325 | |
2012-02-01 | Favorable by- Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 325 | |
2012-01-31 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/01/12, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-31 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | |
2012-01-27 | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time -SJ 283 | |
2012-01-26 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-25 | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 280 | |
2012-01-20 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/25/12, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 34 | |
2011-10-18 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 34 | |
2011-09-26 | Filed |