FL S0346 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies properties that are eligible for classification as working waterfront property. Requires property appraisers to consider specified factors in assessing certain property. Provides for assessment of a portion of property within a working waterfront property which is not used as such property. Requires an application for classification of property as working waterfront property, etc.
Title
Working Waterfront Property [WPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Aronberg [D] | Sen. Charles Dean [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] |
Sen. Nan Rich [D] | Sen. Christopher Smith [D] | Sen. Eleanor Sobel [D] | Sen. Ronda Storms [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0012 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-04-29 | In Messages | |
2010-04-29 | Read 3rd time -SJ 01037; CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 -SJ 01037 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00917 | |
2010-04-23 | Withdrawn from Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00796; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-04-19 | Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00600 | |
2010-04-15 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-13 | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00600; CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -SJ 00601 | |
2010-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 301-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00032; On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/16/10, 10:00 am, 412-K; CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00164; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -SJ 00153; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00164 | |
2010-03-01 | Now in Finance and Tax | |
2010-02-17 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-02-16 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | |
2010-02-04 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/16/10, 10:00 am, 412-K | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-10-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1408 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
H0073 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
H7127 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
H0073 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
H7127 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0193 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0195 | 073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |