FL S0344 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that certain exemptions from court-related fees and charges apply to certain entities; requiring the court to waive any court costs or filing fees for certain proceedings involving public guardians; providing that certain examinations may be performed and reports prepared by a physician assistant or an advanced practice registered nurse under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#682 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Chapter No. 2020-73 | |
2020-06-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-15 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-03 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 12/10/19, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-11-05 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/05/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H211 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 344 passed
H607 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Chapter No. 2020-9
H7053 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H607 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Chapter No. 2020-9
H7053 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 2008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 3675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |