FL S0342 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the payment and distribution of funds in the Cigarette Tax Collection Trust Fund; providing specified purposes for the use of funds that are appropriated out of the trust fund; providing legislative intent; authorizing moneys transferred to the Board of Directors of the H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center and Research Institute to be used to secure financing to pay costs for specified purposes at certain facilities and other properties, etc.
Title
Use of Cigarette Tax Proceeds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch. | |
2012-01-19 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax | |
2012-01-19 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax -SJ 255 | |
2012-01-18 | Now in Budget | |
2012-01-12 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2012-01-12 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Health Regulation (205560); YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 135 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 33 | |
2012-01-03 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 01/12/12, 10:15 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-10-18 | Referred to Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 33 | |
2011-09-23 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/342 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0342/BillText/Filed/HTML |