FL S0338 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renaming the Community Redevelopment Act of 1969; redefining the term "blighted area," as applicable to the Community Redevelopment Act of 1969, to include land previously used as a military facility and adjacent to a county-owned zoological park, etc.
Title
Community Redevelopment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/25/14, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/11/14, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations |
2013-11-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1429 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 330 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 340 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |